OK HB2422 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; creating the Religious Viewpoints Antidiscrimination Act; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; creating the Religious Viewpoints Antidiscrimination Act; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bennett [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Gus Blackwell [R] | Rep. Mike Reynolds [R] |
Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] |
Rep. Steve Vaughan [R] | Sen. Larry Boggs [R] | Rep. Arthur Hulbert [R] | Rep. Bobby Cleveland [R] |
Rep. Dan Fisher [R] | Rep. Ken Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: States' Rights committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: States' Rights committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2014-03-03 | Senate | coauthored by Allen |
2014-02-19 | Senate | coauthored by Boggs |
2014-02-19 | Senate | coauthored by Kern, Vaughan |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2014-02-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze, Reynolds |
2014-02-18 | House | General Order |
2014-02-12 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker, Hulbert, Cleveland, Blackwell, Moore, Fisher |
2014-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass States' Rights Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to States' Rights |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Bennett |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 27 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 27 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 27 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 27 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 27 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 27 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 27 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 27 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |