AK HB1 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to absentee voting, voting, early voting, special needs voting, and voter registration; relating to poll watchers; relating to absentee ballots, questioned ballots, and questioned ballot procedures; relating to which primary election ballot a voter may use; relating to early voting locations at which persons may vote absentee ballots; and relating to qualifications to vote at a municipal election.
Title
Election Registration And Voting
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Tuck [D] | Rep. Harriet Drummond [D] | Rep. Jason Grenn [I] | Sen. Scott Kawasaki [D] |
Rep. Leslie Gara [D] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] | Rep. Geran Tarr [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date Reconsideration (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2017-05-04 | Senate | STA, JUD |
2017-05-04 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-05-01 | House | VERSION: CSHB 1(JUD)(EFD FLD) |
2017-05-01 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-05-01 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2017-05-01 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y22 N18 |
2017-05-01 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y22 N18 |
2017-05-01 | House | RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING |
2017-04-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, TARR |
2017-04-28 | House | MILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2017-04-28 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y30 N8 E1 A1 |
2017-04-28 | House | PASSED Y22 N17 E1 |
2017-04-28 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2017-04-28 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y16 N23 E1 |
2017-04-28 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2017-04-28 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 1(JUD) |
2017-04-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GRENN, KAWASAKI, GARA |
2017-04-27 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/28 CALENDAR |
2017-04-27 | House | JUD CS ADOPTED UC |
2017-04-27 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-27 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | FN2: ZERO(GOV) |
2017-04-19 | House | AM: EASTMAN |
2017-04-19 | House | DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, FANSLER, LEDOUX, CLAMAN |
2017-04-19 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 4DP 1AM |
2017-03-29 | House | FN1: (GOV) |
2017-03-29 | House | NR: JOHNSON, KNOPP, BIRCH |
2017-03-29 | House | DP: WOOL, LEDOUX, TUCK, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2017-03-29 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) NT 4DP 3NR |
2017-01-18 | House | STA, JUD |
2017-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-01-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17 |