AK HB114 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-22 - COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS, JOHNSTON
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-22 - COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS, JOHNSTON
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to a workforce enhancement program for health care professionals employed in the state; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Medical Provider Incentives/loan Repaym't
Sponsors
Rep. Ivy Spohnholz [D] | Rep. Andrea Story [D] | Rep. Jonathan Kreiss-Tomkins [D] | Rep. Jennifer Johnston [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS, JOHNSTON |
2019-04-17 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-17 | House | FN2: (DHS) |
2019-04-17 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2019-04-17 | House | DP: TARR, JACKSON, CLAMAN, DRUMMOND, ZULKOSKY, SPOHNHOLZ |
2019-04-17 | House | HSS RPT 6DP |
2019-04-16 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STORY |
2019-03-27 | House | HSS, FIN |
2019-03-27 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Dentists
Employment
Grants
Health & Social Services
Loans
Medical Care
Mental Health
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Pharmacists
Physicians
Psychologists
Public Assistance
Senior Citizens
State Aid
Sunset
Universities
Unorganized Borough
Employment
Grants
Health & Social Services
Loans
Medical Care
Mental Health
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Pharmacists
Physicians
Psychologists
Public Assistance
Senior Citizens
State Aid
Sunset
Universities
Unorganized Borough
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=HB114 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0114A.PDF |