AK HB122 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Funter Bay marine park unit of the state park system; relating to protection of the social and historical significance of the Unangax cemetery located in Funter Bay and providing for the amendment of the management plan for the Funter Bay marine park unit; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Funter Bay Marine Park: Unangan Cemetery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2020-02-14 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DNR) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | DP: MICCICHE, BISHOP, REVAK, KIEHL, KAWASAKI |
2020-02-14 | Senate | RES RPT 5DP |
2019-05-10 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KIEHL |
2019-05-10 | Senate | RES, FIN |
2019-05-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-05-09 | House | VERSION: HB 122 AM |
2019-05-09 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2019-05-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2019-05-09 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-05-09 | House | PASSED Y29 N4 E1 A6 |
2019-05-09 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2019-05-09 | 958 | |
2019-05-09 | 957 | |
2019-05-09 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS UC |
2019-05-09 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 122 |
2019-05-08 | House | HELD TO 5/9 CALENDAR |
2019-05-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR, JOSEPHSON |
2019-05-07 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/8 CALENDAR |
2019-05-07 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-05-07 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | FIN REFERRAL REMOVED |
2019-04-24 | House | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2019-04-24 | House | NR: RASMUSSEN, HOPKINS, TALERICO |
2019-04-24 | House | DP: HANNAN, TARR, LINCOLN |
2019-04-24 | House | RES RPT 3DP 3NR |
2019-04-16 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS |
2019-04-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN |
2019-04-03 | House | RES, FIN |
2019-04-03 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |