AK HB127 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-27 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-27 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the practice of dental hygiene; relating to advanced practice permits for dental hygienists; relating to dental assistants; prohibiting unfair discrimination under group health insurance against a dental hygienist who holds an advanced practice permit; relating to medical assistance for dental hygiene services; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Dental Hygienist Advanced Prac Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2020-03-27 | Senate | FIN |
2020-03-27 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2020-03-26 | House | VERSION: CSHB 127(FIN) |
2020-03-26 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2020-03-26 | House | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2020-03-25 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR |
2020-03-25 | House | PRUITT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2020-03-25 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2020-03-25 | House | PASSED Y37 E3 |
2020-03-25 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 127(FIN) |
2020-03-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2020-03-24 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/25 CALENDAR |
2020-03-24 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2020-03-24 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2020-03-24 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2020-03-24 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | FN6: (DHS) |
2020-03-11 | House | FN5: ZERO(DHS) |
2020-03-11 | House | FN4: ZERO(CED) |
2020-03-11 | House | NR: CARPENTER, TILTON, MERRICK, SULLIVAN-LEONARD |
2020-03-11 | House | DP: ORTIZ, LEBON, KNOPP, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, JOHNSTON, FOSTER |
2020-03-11 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 7DP 4NR |
2019-05-14 | House | FN3: (DHS) |
2019-05-14 | House | FN2: (CED) |
2019-05-14 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2019-05-14 | House | NR: REVAK, TALERICO |
2019-05-14 | House | DP: HANNAN, STORY, FIELDS, STUTES, WOOL |
2019-05-14 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 5DP 2NR |
2019-04-09 | House | L&C, FIN |
2019-04-09 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Business
Dentists
Insurance
Licensing
Medical Care
Occupations & Professions
Permits
Public Assistance
Business
Dentists
Insurance
Licensing
Medical Care
Occupations & Professions
Permits
Public Assistance