AK HB131 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to relocation assistance for federally assisted public construction and improvement projects and programs; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Relocation Assistance For Fed. Proj/prog
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2018-06-27 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/16 CHAPTER 13 SLA 18 |
2018-06-27 | House | 9:49 AM 5/16/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-04-18 | Senate | VERSION: HB 131 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-04-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-04-18 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2018-04-18 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 131 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-18 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-18 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2018 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DOT) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2018-03-12 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2018-03-12 | Senate | FIN RPT 6DP 1NR |
2017-05-11 | Senate | FIN |
2017-05-11 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-05-10 | House | VERSION: HB 131 |
2017-05-10 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-05-10 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-05-10 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2017-05-10 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 131 |
2017-05-08 | House | TECHNICAL SESSION 5/8 - ON 5/10 CALENDAR |
2017-05-05 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/8 CALENDAR |
2017-05-05 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-05-05 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/2017 |
2017-04-27 | House | FN1: ZERO(DOT) |
2017-04-27 | House | NR: TILTON, PRUITT, WILSON |
2017-04-27 | House | DP: GRENN, GUTTENBERG, THOMPSON, ORTIZ, KAWASAKI, GARA, SEATON, FOSTER |
2017-04-27 | House | FIN RPT 8DP 3NR |
2017-02-24 | House | FN1: ZERO(DOT) |
2017-02-24 | House | NR: NEUMAN |
2017-02-24 | House | DP: KOPP, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, CLAMAN, STUTES, DRUMMOND, WOOL |
2017-02-24 | House | TRA RPT 6DP 1NR |
2017-02-15 | House | TRA, FIN |
2017-02-15 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |