AK HB133 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-21 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-21 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to care of juveniles and to juvenile justice; relating to employment of juvenile probation officers by the Department of Health and Social Services; relating to terms used in juvenile justice; relating to mandatory reporters of child abuse or neglect; relating to sexual assault in the third degree; relating to sexual assault in the fourth degree; repealing a requirement for administrative revocation of a minor's driver's license, permit, privilege to drive, or privilege to obtain a license for consumption or possession of alcohol or drugs; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Juveniles: Justice,facilites,treatment
Sponsors
Rep. Ivy Spohnholz [D] | Rep. Colleen Sullivan-Leonard [R] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] |
Rep. Tiffany Zulkosky [D] | Rep. Sara Rasmussen [R] | Sen. Tom Begich [D] | Sen. Elvi Gray-Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-03-21 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2020-03-21 | Senate | DP: WILSON, BEGICH, SHOWER |
2020-03-21 | Senate | HSS RPT 3DP |
2020-03-02 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH, GRAY-JACKSON |
2020-03-02 | Senate | HSS, JUD |
2020-03-02 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2020-02-28 | House | VERSION: HB 133 |
2020-02-28 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2020-02-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY, RASMUSSEN |
2020-02-28 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2020-02-28 | House | PASSED Y35 E5 |
2020-02-28 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 133 |
2020-02-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD, JOSEPHSON, TUCK |
2020-02-26 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/28 CALENDAR |
2020-02-26 | 1704 | |
2020-02-26 | 1704 | |
2020-02-26 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2020-02-26 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2020-02-12 | House | NR: SHAW, EASTMAN |
2020-02-12 | House | DP: DRUMMOND, STUTES, CLAMAN |
2020-02-12 | House | JUD RPT 3DP 2NR |
2019-04-26 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2019-04-26 | House | DP: TARR, DRUMMOND, ZULKOSKY, SPOHNHOLZ |
2019-04-26 | House | HSS RPT 4DP |
2019-04-15 | House | HSS, JUD |
2019-04-15 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Child Custody
Civil Procedure
Corrections
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Foster Care
Government Organization
Health & Social Services
Hearings
Law Enforcement
Liability
Minors
Sentencing
Youth Centers
Child Custody
Civil Procedure
Corrections
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Foster Care
Government Organization
Health & Social Services
Hearings
Law Enforcement
Liability
Minors
Sentencing
Youth Centers