AK HB140 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-15 - WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-15 - WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the right to demand a jury trial in cases involving termination of parental rights; amending Rules 18(b), 18(e), and 18(g), Alaska Child in Need of Aid Rules of Procedure.
Title
Jury Trials For Term. Of Parental Rights
Sponsors
Rep. Tammie Wilson [R] | Rep. Gabrielle LeDoux [R] | Rep. George Rauscher [R] | Rep. Dean Westlake [D] |
Rep. David Eastman [R] | Rep. Charisse Millett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-15 | House | WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR |
2017-03-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): EASTMAN, MILLETT |
2017-02-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): WESTLAKE |
2017-02-22 | House | REFERRED TO HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES |
2017-02-22 | House | HSS, JUD |
2017-02-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HB140 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0140A.PDF |