AK HB20 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/11/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/11/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to marriage solemnization; and authorizing elected public officials in the state to solemnize marriages.
Title
Solemnize Marriage: Elected Officials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 8 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 8 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 6 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 3 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 3 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 8 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 6 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 3 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 3 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/11/18 |
2018-06-27 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/13 CHAPTER 20 SLA 18 |
2018-06-27 | House | 8:40 AM 6/5/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-05-02 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2018-05-02 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 20(JUD) |
2018-05-02 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-02 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N2 E1 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 20(JUD) |
2018-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-02 | Senate | AM NO 1 FAILED Y8 N11 E1 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-02 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2018 |
2018-04-14 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DHS)(UPDATED FROM RULES) |
2018-04-14 | Senate | NR: COSTELLO, SHOWER |
2018-04-14 | Senate | DP: COGHILL |
2018-04-14 | Senate | JUD RPT 1DP 2NR |
2018-04-09 | Senate | JUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DHS)(UPDATED FROM RULES) |
2018-04-04 | Senate | AM: WILSON |
2018-04-04 | Senate | NR: GIESSEL, COGHILL |
2018-04-04 | Senate | DP: MEYER, EGAN |
2018-04-04 | Senate | STA RPT 2DP 2NR 1AM |
2018-02-21 | Senate | STA, JUD |
2018-02-21 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-02-19 | House | VERSION: CSHB 20(JUD) |
2018-02-19 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-02-19 | House | PASSED Y29 N6 E3 A1 V1 |
2018-02-19 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2018-02-19 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y6 N29 E3 A1 V1 |
2018-02-19 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y3 N33 E3 V1 |
2018-02-19 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC |
2018-02-19 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 20(JUD) |
2018-02-16 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/19 CALENDAR |
2018-02-16 | House | JUD CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-02-16 | House | FN2: ZERO(DHS)(UPDATED FROM RULES) |
2018-02-16 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-02-12 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/16/2018 |
2017-03-15 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2017-03-15 | House | AM: EASTMAN, REINBOLD |
2017-03-15 | House | NR: FANSLER |
2017-03-15 | House | DP: KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, LEDOUX, CLAMAN |
2017-03-15 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 1NR 2AM |
2017-02-22 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2017-02-22 | House | DNP: JOHNSON, BIRCH |
2017-02-22 | House | DP: TUCK, KNOPP, JOSEPHSON, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2017-02-22 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) 4DP 2DNP |
2017-01-18 | House | STA, JUD |
2017-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-01-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17 |