AK HB20 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - FIN WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23 UC
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - FIN WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23 UC
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to sexual assault; relating to the definitions of 'without consent' and 'consent'; relating to failure to report a violent crime; relating to sexual misconduct under the code of military justice; requiring law enforcement agencies to test sexual assault examination kits; requiring notification of completion of testing; relating to reports on untested sexual assault examination kits; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Sexual Assault Examination Kits
Sponsors
Rep. Geran Tarr [D] | Rep. Ivy Spohnholz [D] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] | Rep. George Rauscher [R] |
Rep. Grier Hopkins [D] | Rep. William Fields [D] | Rep. Harriet Drummond [D] | Rep. Sara Rasmussen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | FIN WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23 UC |
2019-04-22 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-22 | House | FN4: (DPS) |
2019-04-22 | House | FN3: INDETERMINATE(LAW) |
2019-04-22 | House | FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2019-04-22 | House | FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2019-04-22 | House | NR: WOOL |
2019-04-22 | House | DP: STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS, FIELDS |
2019-04-22 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) NT 3DP 1NR |
2019-03-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RASMUSSEN |
2019-03-11 | House | STA, FIN |
2019-03-11 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-03-11 | House | SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED |
2019-02-20 | House | STA, FIN |
2019-02-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-02-20 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/19 |