AK HB200 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-12 - COSPONSOR(S): STUTES
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-12 - COSPONSOR(S): STUTES
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing a top two nonpartisan open primary election system for elective state executive and state and national legislative offices; repealing the special runoff election for the office of United States senator or United States representative; changing appointment procedures relating to precinct watchers and members of precinct election boards, election district absentee and questioned ballot counting boards, and the Alaska Public Offices Commission; requiring certain written notices to appear in election pamphlets and polling places; relating to declarations of candidacy and letters of intent; and amending the definition of 'political party.'
Title
Nonpartisan Open Primary Elections
Sponsors
Rep. Gabrielle LeDoux [R] | Sen. Scott Kawasaki [D] | Rep. Adam Wool [D] | Rep. Daniel Ortiz [I] |
Rep. Louise Stutes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STUTES |
2017-05-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ |
2017-05-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): WOOL |
2017-04-19 | House | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2017-04-19 | House | FN1: ZERO(GOV) |
2017-04-19 | House | AM: FANSLER |
2017-04-19 | House | NR: KREISS-TOMKINS, CLAMAN |
2017-04-19 | House | DNP: EASTMAN, KOPP |
2017-04-19 | House | DP: LEDOUX |
2017-04-19 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 1DP 2DNP 2NR 1AM |
2017-04-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI |
2017-03-29 | House | JUD, STA |
2017-03-29 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HB200 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0200A.PDF |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0200B.PDF |