AK HB203 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/28/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/28/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to transportation of live crab.
Title
Transportation Of Live Crab
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Knopp [R] | Rep. Louise Stutes [R] | Rep. Sarah Vance [R] | Rep. Geran Tarr [D] |
Rep. Sara Hannan [D] | Sen. Peter Micciche [R] | Sen. Gary Stevens [R] | Sen. Bert Stedman [R] |
Sen. Click Bishop [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/28/20 |
2020-05-18 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 4/29 CHAPTER 25 SLA 20 |
2020-05-18 | House | 10:00 A.M. 4/13/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-03-25 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 203(FSH) |
2020-03-25 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2020-03-25 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, STEVENS, STEDMAN, BISHOP |
2020-03-25 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 203(FSH) |
2020-03-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2020-03-25 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2020-03-25 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/2020 |
2020-03-24 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2020-03-24 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DFG) |
2020-03-24 | Senate | NR: REVAK, KAWASAKI |
2020-03-24 | Senate | DP: MICCICHE, KIEHL, BISHOP, COGHILL |
2020-03-24 | Senate | RES RPT 4DP 2NR |
2020-03-06 | Senate | RES |
2020-03-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2020-03-05 | House | VERSION: CSHB 203(FSH) |
2020-03-05 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2020-03-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR, HANNAN |
2020-03-05 | House | PASSED Y33 E6 A1 |
2020-03-05 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 203(FSH) |
2020-03-04 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/5 CALENDAR |
2020-03-04 | House | FSH CS ADOPTED UC |
2020-03-04 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2020-03-04 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-24 | House | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2020-02-24 | House | FN1: ZERO(DFG) |
2020-02-24 | House | DP: TUCK, HANNAN, TALERICO, HOPKINS, TARR, LINCOLN |
2020-02-24 | House | RES RPT CS(FSH) 6DP |
2020-02-05 | House | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2020-02-05 | House | FN1: ZERO(DFG) |
2020-02-05 | House | DP: VANCE, KOPP, EDGMON, NEUMAN, STUTES |
2020-02-05 | House | FSH RPT CS(FSH) 5DP |
2020-02-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): VANCE |
2020-01-21 | House | FSH, RES |
2020-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |