AK HB212 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on August 1 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-01 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 8/24/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on August 1 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-01 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 8/24/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to funding for school construction and major maintenance; relating to the regional educational attendance area and small municipal school district fund; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School Construction;reaa/small Muni Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Foster [D] | Rep. Dean Westlake [D] | Rep. Tammie Wilson [R] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] |
Rep. Louise Stutes [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-11 - House - House: Concur (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-01 | House | DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 8/24/18 |
2018-08-01 | House | 3:50 PM 8/1/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-27 | House | FN2: (EED) |
2018-06-27 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286 |
2018-06-27 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18 |
2018-06-27 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-05-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-11 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 N4 |
2018-05-11 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2018-05-11 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2018-05-11 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 212(FIN) |
2018-05-11 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2018-05-11 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-11 | Senate | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y19 N- E1 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2018-05-11 | Senate | GARDNER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2018-05-11 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-11 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N- E1 A2 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 212(FIN) |
2018-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-11 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2018-05-11 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-11 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | FN2: (EED) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, OLSON, MICCICHE |
2018-05-08 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 7DP SAME TITLE |
2018-04-14 | Senate | FIN |
2018-04-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-13 | House | VERSION: CSHB 212(RLS) |
2018-04-13 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, STUTES |
2018-04-13 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-04-13 | House | PASSED Y36 A4 |
2018-04-13 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 212(RLS) |
2018-04-13 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-13 | House | RLS CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-13 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-13 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2018 |
2018-04-13 | House | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2018-04-13 | House | NR: CHENAULT, REINBOLD, EASTMAN, LEDOUX |
2018-04-13 | House | DP: TUCK, CLAMAN, STUTES |
2018-04-13 | House | RLS RPT CS(RLS) NT 3DP 4NR |
2018-04-12 | House | RLS WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23A |
2018-04-02 | House | COSPONSOR(S): WILSON |
2018-04-02 | House | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2018-04-02 | House | NR: TILTON, PRUITT, KAWASAKI |
2018-04-02 | House | DP: GUTTENBERG, ORTIZ, GARA, WILSON, SEATON, FOSTER |
2018-04-02 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 6DP 3NR |
2018-02-26 | House | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2018-02-26 | House | DP: TALERICO, PARISH, JOHNSTON, SPOHNHOLZ, DRUMMOND |
2018-02-26 | House | EDC RPT 5DP |
2018-02-09 | House | BILL REPRINTED 2/9/18 |
2018-02-09 | House | PRIME SPONSOR: FOSTER |
2017-04-05 | House | EDC, FIN |
2017-04-05 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |