AK HB219 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to background investigation requirements for state employees whose job duties require access to certain federal tax information; relating to current or prospective contractors with the state with access to certain federal tax information; establishing state personnel procedures required for employee access to certain federal tax information; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Crim Hist Check: St Employees/contractors
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 3 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 3 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/18 |
2018-06-27 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/15 CHAPTER 25 SLA 18 |
2018-06-27 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-06-27 | House | 3:05 PM 6/13/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-27 | House | FN14: (REV) |
2018-06-27 | House | FN13: (REV) |
2018-06-27 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286 |
2018-06-27 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 219(JUD) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-08 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-08 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 219(JUD) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-08 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-08 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | FN14: (REV) |
2018-05-02 | Senate | FN13: (REV) |
2018-05-02 | Senate | FN12: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2018-05-02 | Senate | FN8: ZERO(LWF) |
2018-05-02 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2018-05-02 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2018-05-02 | Senate | FIN RPT 6DP 1NR |
2018-04-17 | Senate | FIN |
2018-04-17 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-16 | House | VERSION: CSHB 219(JUD) |
2018-04-16 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-04-16 | House | PASSED Y33 N6 A1 |
2018-04-16 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 219(JUD) |
2018-04-16 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-16 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y19 N20 A1 |
2018-04-16 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y3 N35 A2 |
2018-04-16 | House | JUD CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-16 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-16 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-06 | House | FN11: (REV) |
2018-04-06 | House | FN10: (REV) |
2018-04-06 | House | FN9: ZERO(DPS) |
2018-04-06 | House | FN8: ZERO(LWF) |
2018-04-06 | House | FN7: ZERO(DHS) |
2018-04-06 | House | FN6: ZERO(COR) |
2018-04-06 | House | AM: WILSON, KAWASAKI, TILTON |
2018-04-06 | House | NR: PRUITT, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GRENN |
2018-04-06 | House | DP: GARA, GUTTENBERG, SEATON, FOSTER |
2018-04-06 | House | FIN RPT CS(JUD) NT 4DP 4NR 3AM |
2018-03-12 | House | FN11: (REV) |
2018-03-12 | House | FN10: (REV) |
2018-03-12 | House | FN9: ZERO(DPS) |
2018-03-12 | House | FN8: ZERO(LWF) |
2018-03-12 | House | FN7: ZERO(DHS) |
2018-03-12 | House | FN6: ZERO(COR) |
2018-03-12 | House | NR: LEDOUX |
2018-03-12 | House | DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, STUTES, CLAMAN |
2018-03-12 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 3DP 1NR |
2017-04-07 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2017-04-07 | House | FN5: (REV) |
2017-04-07 | House | FN4: ZERO(DPS) |
2017-04-07 | House | FN3: ZERO(LWF) |
2017-04-07 | House | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2017-04-07 | House | FN1: ZERO(COR) |
2017-04-07 | House | JUD, FIN |
2017-04-07 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |