AK HB22 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination date of the Statewide Suicide Prevention Council; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extend Suicide Prevention Council
Sponsors
Rep. Geran Tarr [D] | Rep. Tiffany Zulkosky [D] | Rep. Sharon Jackson [R] | Rep. Daniel Ortiz [I] |
Rep. Andrea Story [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-29 | House | FN1: (DHS) |
2019-03-29 | House | NR: PRUITT |
2019-03-29 | House | DP: TARR, CLAMAN, DRUMMOND, SPOHNHOLZ |
2019-03-29 | House | HSS RPT 4DP 1NR |
2019-03-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ, STORY |
2019-03-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JACKSON |
2019-02-20 | House | HSS, FIN |
2019-02-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-02-20 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/19 |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=HB22 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0022A.PDF |