AK HB25 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH, GARDNER
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH, GARDNER
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to insurance coverage for contraceptives and related services; and relating to medical assistance coverage for contraceptives and related services.
Title
Contraceptives Coverage:insure;med Assist
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Sustain Ruling of the Chair/Amendment No. 11 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Sustain Ruling of the Chair/Amendment No. 11 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 9 as amended (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 7 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 7 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 16 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 10 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 10 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Sustain Ruling of the Chair/Amendment No. 11 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Sustain Ruling of the Chair/Amendment No. 11 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 9 as amended (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 7 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 7 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 16 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 10 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 10 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH, GARDNER |
2018-04-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES |
2018-04-10 | Senate | HSS, FIN |
2018-04-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-09 | House | VERSION: CSHB 25(FIN) AM(EFD FLD) |
2018-04-09 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON |
2018-04-09 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2018-04-09 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y23 N15 E2 |
2018-04-09 | House | PASSED Y21 N17 E2 |
2018-04-09 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING |
2018-04-06 | House | HELD TO 4/9 CALENDAR |
2018-04-06 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2018-04-06 | House | SUSTAINED RULING OF CHAIR Y22 N12 E5 A1 |
2018-04-06 | House | AM NO 11 RULED OUT OF ORDER |
2018-04-06 | House | AM NO 11 OFFERED |
2018-04-06 | House | AM NO 9 AS AM FAILED Y16 N19 E5 |
2018-04-06 | House | AM 1 TO AM 9 ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-06 | House | AM NO 9 OFFERED |
2018-04-06 | House | AM NO 8 FAILED Y17 N18 E5 |
2018-04-06 | House | AM NO 7 FAILED Y15 N21 E4 |
2018-04-06 | House | AM NO 6 FAILED Y16 N20 E4 |
2018-04-06 | House | AM NO 5 NOT OFFERED |
2018-04-06 | House | AM NO 4 FAILED Y16 N20 E4 |
2018-04-06 | House | AM NO 3 NOT OFFERED |
2018-04-06 | House | AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED |
2018-04-06 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-06 | House | AM NO 10 ADOPTED Y20 N16 E4 |
2018-04-06 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC |
2018-04-06 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 25(FIN) |
2018-04-06 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2018-04-06 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2018-04-05 | House | HELD TO 4/6 CALENDAR |
2018-04-04 | House | HELD TO 4/5 CALENDAR |
2018-04-02 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 4/2 - ON 4/4 CALENDAR |
2018-04-02 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2018-03-30 | House | HELD TO 4/2 CALENDAR |
2018-03-29 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/30 CALENDAR |
2018-03-29 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-03-29 | House | FN7: (DHS)(UPDATED FROM RULES) |
2018-03-29 | House | FN6: ZERO(CED)(UPDATED FROM RULES) |
2018-03-29 | House | FN5: ZERO(ADM)(UPDATED FROM RULES) |
2018-03-29 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-03-28 | House | TECHNICAL SESSION 3/28 - ON 3/29 CALENDAR |
2018-03-28 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2018-02-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2018-02-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR |
2017-05-15 | House | FN4: ZERO(ADM) |
2017-05-15 | House | FN3: (DHS) |
2017-05-15 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2017-05-15 | House | AM: PRUITT, TILTON, GRENN, WILSON |
2017-05-15 | House | DNP: NEUMAN |
2017-05-15 | House | DP: GUTTENBERG, ORTIZ, GARA, KAWASAKI, SEATON, FOSTER |
2017-05-15 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 6DP 1DNP 4AM |
2017-05-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GARA |
2017-04-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FANSLER |
2017-04-12 | House | FN3: (DHS) |
2017-04-12 | House | FN2: (DHS) |
2017-04-12 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2017-04-12 | House | AM: JOHNSTON |
2017-04-12 | House | NR: EDGMON |
2017-04-12 | House | DNP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, EASTMAN |
2017-04-12 | House | DP: TARR, KITO, SPOHNHOLZ |
2017-04-12 | House | HSS RPT CS(HSS) 3DP 2DNP 1NR 1AM |
2017-02-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2017-01-18 | House | HSS, FIN |
2017-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-01-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17 |