AK HB260 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/14/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/14/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to possession of certain licenses, tags, and permits issued by the Department of Fish and Game; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Fish & Game Licenses; Electronic Form
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/14/18 |
2018-07-16 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/13 CHAPTER 54 SLA 18 |
2018-07-09 | House | 1:37 PM 7/9/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-05-11 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 260(FIN) AM |
2018-05-11 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-11 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-11 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON, MEYER, EGAN, GARDNER, HUGHES, COSTELLO |
2018-05-11 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 260(FIN) AM |
2018-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-11 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-11 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DFG) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | AM: OLSON, MICCICHE |
2018-05-10 | Senate | NR: HOFFMAN, BISHOP |
2018-05-10 | Senate | DP: MACKINNON, VON IMHOF, STEVENS |
2018-05-10 | Senate | FIN RPT 3DP 2NR 2AM |
2018-05-07 | Senate | FIN |
2018-05-07 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-05-04 | House | VERSION: CSHB 260(FIN) AM |
2018-05-04 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-05-04 | House | JOSEPHSON, TUCK |
2018-05-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD, BIRCH, MILLETT, STUTES, KAWASAKI, ORTIZ, |
2018-05-04 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-04 | House | PASSED Y37 E2 A1 |
2018-05-04 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 260(FIN) AM |
2018-05-04 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-04 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y28 N9 E2 A1 |
2018-05-04 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-05-04 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-04 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/4/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KOPP |
2018-04-17 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GARA, THOMPSON, PRUITT, WILSON |
2018-04-17 | House | FN1: ZERO(DFG) |
2018-04-17 | House | DP: GARA, WILSON, PRUITT, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, TILTON, SEATON, FOSTER |
2018-04-17 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 9DP |
2018-04-06 | House | FN1: ZERO(DFG) |
2018-04-06 | House | NR: PARISH, JOSEPHSON |
2018-04-06 | House | DP: BIRCH, TALERICO, LINCOLN, DRUMMOND, TARR |
2018-04-06 | House | RES RPT CS(RES) NT 5DP 2NR |
2018-03-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN |
2018-02-28 | House | FN1: ZERO(DFG) |
2018-02-28 | House | DP: EDGMON, EASTMAN, NEUMAN, KREISS-TOMKINS, CHENAULT, STUTES |
2018-02-28 | House | FSH RPT 6DP |
2018-01-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GRENN |
2018-01-16 | House | FSH, RES, FIN |
2018-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-01-08 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/18 |