AK HB27 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the manufacture, sale, distribution, and labeling of child-related products containing certain flame retardant chemicals; relating to an interstate chemicals clearinghouse; adding unlawful acts to the Alaska Unfair Trade Practices and Consumer Protection Act; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Regulation Of Flame Retardant Chemicals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-03-17 | House | FN2: ZERO(LAW) |
2020-03-17 | House | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2020-03-17 | House | NR: GILLIS |
2020-03-17 | House | DP: HANNAN, STORY, FIELDS, STUTES, SPOHNHOLZ |
2020-03-17 | House | L&C RPT CS(RES) NT 5DP 1NR |
2020-02-07 | House | FN2: ZERO(LAW) |
2020-02-07 | House | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2020-02-07 | House | NR: TALERICO, RAUSCHER |
2020-02-07 | House | DP: TUCK, HANNAN, HOPKINS, TARR, LINCOLN |
2020-02-07 | House | RES RPT CS(RES) NT 5DP 2NR |
2020-02-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2019-02-20 | House | RES, L&C |
2019-02-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-02-20 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/11/19 |
Subjects
Attorney General
Consumer Affairs
Environmental Concerns
Families
Hazardous Substances
Health & Social Services
Minors
Public Safety
Regulations
Sales
Trade Practices
Consumer Affairs
Environmental Concerns
Families
Hazardous Substances
Health & Social Services
Minors
Public Safety
Regulations
Sales
Trade Practices
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=HB27 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0027A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0027B.PDF |