AK HB401 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/14/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/14/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to insurance; relating to credit for reinsurance; relating to insurance standard valuation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Insurance; Reinsurance;valuation; Credits
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/14/18 |
2018-07-16 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/13 CHAPTER 56 SLA 18 |
2018-07-09 | House | 1:37 PM 7/9/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-27 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-05-11 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 401(L&C) |
2018-05-11 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-11 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-11 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 401(L&C) |
2018-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-11 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-11 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | NR: STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2018-04-23 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, GARDNER |
2018-04-23 | Senate | L&C RPT 2DP 2NR |
2018-04-14 | Senate | L&C |
2018-04-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-13 | House | VERSION: CSHB 401(L&C) |
2018-04-13 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-13 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-04-13 | House | PASSED Y36 N3 A1 |
2018-04-13 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 401(L&C) |
2018-04-12 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 4/12 - ON 4/13 CALENDAR |
2018-04-11 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/12 CALENDAR |
2018-04-11 | House | L&C CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-11 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-11 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-02 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2018-04-02 | House | NR: WOOL, JOSEPHSON, EDGMON |
2018-04-02 | House | DP: KITO |
2018-04-02 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 1DP 3NR |
2018-03-05 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2018-03-05 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2018-03-05 | House | L&C |
2018-03-05 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |