AK HB82 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act adding to the powers and duties of the State Commission for Human Rights; and relating to and prohibiting discrimination based on sexual orientation or gender identity or expression.
Title
Discrimination: Gender Id.;sexual Orient.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2019-07-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN |
2019-04-30 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STORY |
2019-04-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2019-04-24 | House | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-04-24 | House | FN1: ZERO(GOV) |
2019-04-24 | House | DNP: VANCE, SHAW |
2019-04-24 | House | DP: WOOL, STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS, FIELDS |
2019-04-24 | House | STA RPT 4DP 2DNP |
2019-04-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN |
2019-04-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2019-03-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR |
2019-03-06 | House | STA, JUD |
2019-03-06 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Advertising
Boards & Commissions
Business
Credit
Employment
Executive Branch
Families
Financial Institutions
Housing
Labor Unions
Leases
Loans
Municipalities
Property
Public Accommodations
Rights
Sales
School Districts
Wages
Boards & Commissions
Business
Credit
Employment
Executive Branch
Families
Financial Institutions
Housing
Labor Unions
Leases
Loans
Municipalities
Property
Public Accommodations
Rights
Sales
School Districts
Wages
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=HB82 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0082A.PDF |