AK HB83 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to voting by electronic transmission in a state election.
Title
Prohibit Voting By Facsimile
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 9 (Y: 2 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 7 (Y: 3 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 9 (Y: 2 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 7 (Y: 3 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2020-02-14 | Senate | STA |
2020-02-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2020-02-12 | House | VERSION: CSHB 83(STA) AM(EFD DEL) |
2020-02-12 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2020-02-12 | House | COSPONSOR REMOVED: NEUMAN |
2020-02-12 | House | PASSED Y28 N11 V1 |
2020-02-12 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 83(STA) AM(EFD DEL) |
2020-02-10 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/12 CALENDAR |
2020-02-10 | 1588 | |
2020-02-10 | 1588 | |
2020-02-10 | 1587 | |
2020-02-10 | 1585 | |
2020-02-10 | 1585 | |
2020-02-10 | 1584 | |
2020-02-10 | 1582 | |
2020-02-10 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2020-02-10 | 1582 | |
2020-02-10 | 1581 | |
2020-02-10 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2020-02-10 | House | STA CS ADOPTED UC |
2020-02-10 | House | FN2: ZERO(GOV)(UPDATED FROM RULES) |
2020-02-10 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2020-02-10 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/10/2020 |
2019-03-29 | House | RETURNED TO RULES COMMITTEE |
2019-03-29 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2019-03-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN |
2019-03-27 | House | HELD IN SECOND READING TO 3/29 CALENDAR |
2019-03-25 | House | HELD IN SECOND READING TO 3/27 CALENDAR |
2019-03-20 | House | HELD IN SECOND READING TO NEXT CALENDAR |
2019-03-20 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-03-20 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-15 | House | FN1: ZERO(GOV) |
2019-03-15 | House | DP: VANCE, LEDOUX, WOOL, STORY, SHAW, FIELDS, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2019-03-15 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) 7DP |
2019-03-06 | House | STA |
2019-03-06 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |