AK HB88 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/15/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/15/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act naming the Trooper Gabe Rich Memorial Bridge.
Title
Naming Trooper Gabe Rich Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/15/19 |
2019-05-20 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/17 CHAPTER 4 SLA 19 |
2019-05-14 | House | 5:25 P.M. 5/13/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-04-08 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): STEDMAN, STEVENS, COSTELLO, KIEHL, OLSON |
2019-04-08 | Senate | VERSION: HB 88 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2019-04-08 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 88 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-04-08 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-04-08 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DOT) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | DP: HUGHES, SHOWER, WILSON, KIEHL |
2019-04-03 | Senate | TRA RPT 4DP |
2019-03-29 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): BISHOP, COGHILL, MICCICHE, KAWASAKI, HUGHES |
2019-03-29 | Senate | TRA |
2019-03-29 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-03-27 | House | VERSION: HB 88 |
2019-03-27 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2019-03-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): EASTMAN, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, TILTON, RAUSCHER, NEUMAN, THOMPSON |
2019-03-27 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2019-03-27 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 88 |
2019-03-27 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-03-27 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-03-27 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-22 | House | FN1: ZERO(DOT) |
2019-03-22 | House | DP: STORY, RASMUSSEN, DRUMMOND, CLAMAN, TALERICO, WOOL, STUTES |
2019-03-22 | House | TRA RPT 7DP |
2019-03-08 | House | TRA |
2019-03-08 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |