AK HB96 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to Alaska Pioneers' Home and Alaska Veterans' Home payments, rates, and services; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pioneers' Home And Veterans' Home Rates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-24 - House - House: Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-18HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
2020-05-18HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 4/29 CHAPTER 23 SLA 20
2020-05-18HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2020-05-18House10:00 A.M. 4/13/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2020-05-18HouseFN10: (DHS)
2020-05-18HouseFN9: (DHS)(CORRECTED)
2020-05-18HouseFN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 205
2020-05-18HouseLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/3/20
2020-03-24HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2020-03-24HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y33 E3 A4
2020-03-24HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2020-03-24HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2020-03-24SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 96(FIN)
2020-03-24SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2020-03-24SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2020-03-24SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2020-03-24SenateFN9: (DHS)(CORRECTED)
2020-03-24SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 96(FIN)
2020-03-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/24 CALENDAR
2020-03-23SenateFIN SCS ADOPTED UC
2020-03-23SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2020-03-23SenateRULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 3/23/2020
2020-03-23SenateFN10: (DHS)
2020-03-23SenateFN9: (DHS)
2020-03-23SenateNR: WILSON
2020-03-23SenateDP: STEDMAN, VON IMHOF, OLSON, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI
2020-03-23SenateFIN RPT SCS 6DP 1NR TECH TITLE CHANGE
2020-02-14SenateFN8: (DHS)
2020-02-14SenateFN7: (DHS)
2020-02-14SenateAM: WILSON
2020-02-14SenateDP: BEGICH, VON IMHOF, GIESSEL
2020-02-14SenateHSS RPT 3DP 1AM
2020-01-29SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL
2020-01-27SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): KIEHL
2019-05-11SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, BEGICH, GRAY-JACKSON
2019-05-10SenateHSS, FIN
2019-05-10SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-05-10HouseVERSION: CSHB 96(FIN)
2019-05-10HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2019-05-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
2019-05-10HousePASSED Y35 N4 E1
2019-05-10HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 96(FIN)
2019-05-10HouseMOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2019-05-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): HANNAN
2019-05-09HouseHELD TO 5/10 CALENDAR
2019-05-08HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/9 CALENDAR
2019-05-08HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2019-05-08HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-08HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2019
2019-05-07HouseFN6: (DHS)
2019-05-07HouseFN5: (DHS)(CORRECTED)
2019-05-07HouseNR: JOHNSTON, LEBON, TILTON, MERRICK, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, WILSON
2019-05-07HouseDP: ORTIZ, KNOPP, JOSEPHSON, FOSTER
2019-05-07HouseCORRECTED FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 4DP 6NR
2019-05-06HouseFN5: (DHS)
2019-05-06HouseFN3: (DHS)
2019-05-06HouseNR: JOHNSTON, TILTON, LEBON, MERRICK, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, WILSON
2019-05-06HouseDP: KNOPP, JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, FOSTER
2019-05-06HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 4DP 6NR
2019-04-30HouseCOSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
2019-04-24HouseFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER HSS
2019-04-24HouseFN4: (DHS)
2019-04-24HouseFN3: (DHS)
2019-04-24HouseAM: PRUITT
2019-04-24HouseNR: JACKSON
2019-04-24HouseDP: DRUMMOND, TARR, ZULKOSKY, SPOHNHOLZ
2019-04-24HouseHSS RPT CS(STA) 4DP 1NR 1AM
2019-04-03HouseFN2: (H.STA/DHS)
2019-04-03HouseFN1: (H.STA/DHS)
2019-04-03HouseNR: LEDOUX, WOOL, STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS
2019-04-03HouseDP: SHAW, FIELDS
2019-04-03HouseSTA RPT CS(STA) 2DP 4NR
2019-03-15HouseSTA, HSS
2019-03-15HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback