AK HCR101 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - BICAMERAL PERMANENT FUND WORKING GROUP REPORT RECEIVED
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - BICAMERAL PERMANENT FUND WORKING GROUP REPORT RECEIVED
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bicameral Permanent Fund Working Group
Title
Bicameral Permanent Fund Working Group
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage Amendment No. 1 (Y: 10 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-09 - House - House: Take up (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-09 - House - House: Take up (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage Amendment No. 1 (Y: 10 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-09 - House - House: Take up (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-09 - House - House: Take up (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Senate | BICAMERAL PERMANENT FUND WORKING GROUP REPORT RECEIVED |
2019-10-23 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 10/10 LEGIS RESOLVE 13 |
2019-10-23 | House | 11:37 A.M. 8/13/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-12 | House | MERRICK |
2019-06-12 | House | MEMBERS: JOHNSTON (CO-CHAIR), WOOL, KREISS-TOMKINS, |
2019-06-10 | Senate | VERSION: HCR101 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2019-06-10 | Senate | MEMBERS: BISHOP (CO-CHAIR), HUGHES, OLSON, STEDMAN |
2019-06-10 | Senate | PASSED Y11 N9 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2019-06-10 | 1310 | |
2019-06-10 | Senate | TAKEN UP UC |
2019-06-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |
2019-06-09 | House | VERSION: HCR 101 |
2019-06-09 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2019-06-09 | House | PASSED Y22 N15 E3 |
2019-06-09 | House | TAKEN UP UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS Y23 N14 E3 |
2019-06-09 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2019-06-09 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |