AK HCR20 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - PERMANENTLY FILED 4/13 LEGIS RESOLVE 34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - PERMANENTLY FILED 4/13 LEGIS RESOLVE 34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proclaiming the month of April 2010 to be Sexual Assault Awareness Month.
Title
Sexual Assault Awareness Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | PERMANENTLY FILED 4/13 LEGIS RESOLVE 34 | |
2010-04-06 | 3:44 PM 4/5/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-03-29 | VERSION: HCR 20 | |
2010-03-29 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-03-29 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-03-29 | COGHILL, ELLIS, PASKVAN, EGAN, MEYER, MCGUIRE, STEDMAN, HUGGINS | |
2010-03-29 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): DAVIS, FRENCH, WAGONER, BUNDE, OLSON, DYSON, THOMAS, KOOKESH, | |
2010-03-29 | BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE | |
2010-03-29 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-29 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | FN1: ZERO(H.STA) | |
2010-03-25 | DP: MENARD, KOOKESH, PASKVAN, MEYER | |
2010-03-25 | STA RPT 4DP | |
2010-03-12 | STA | |
2010-03-12 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-10 | VERSION: HCR 20 | |
2010-03-10 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-03-10 | MILLETT, KELLER, GUTTENBERG | |
2010-03-10 | COSPONSOR(S): RAMRAS, DAHLSTROM, JOHNSON, PETERSEN, KERTTULA, LYNN, BUCH, TUCK, | |
2010-03-10 | PASSED Y38 E2 | |
2010-03-10 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-10 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/10/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | FN1: ZERO(H.STA) | |
2010-03-10 | DP: JOHNSON, GATTO, SEATON, GRUENBERG, PETERSEN, LYNN | |
2010-03-10 | STA RPT 6DP | |
2010-03-08 | COSPONSOR(S): JOHANSEN | |
2010-02-17 | STA | |
2010-02-17 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |