AK HJR33 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 20 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 20 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the Alaska delegation in Congress to pursue the establishment of a U.S. Coast Guard port in the Arctic region; supporting the increase in defensive capabilities in the Arctic region; and encouraging the development of critical Arctic infrastructure.
Title
Develop: Arctic Infrastructure/defense
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-04-23 | House | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2018-04-20 | Senate | VERSION: CSHJR 33(AET) |
2018-04-20 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-04-20 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-04-20 | Senate | MACKINNON, STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, MEYER |
2018-04-20 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON, WIELECHOWSKI, EGAN, HUGHES, MICCICHE, COSTELLO, SHOWER |
2018-04-20 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 33(AET) |
2018-04-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-20 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-20 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL, BISHOP, OLSON |
2018-04-18 | Senate | ARC RPT 3DP |
2018-04-06 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, GARDNER, STEVENS, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, KELLY |
2018-04-06 | Senate | ARC |
2018-04-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-04 | House | VERSION: CSHJR 33(AET) |
2018-04-04 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, SPOHNHOLZ, GRENN, DRUMMOND |
2018-04-04 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y40 |
2018-04-04 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2018-04-04 | House | CLAMAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2018-04-04 | House | PASSED Y39 N1 |
2018-04-04 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 33(AET) |
2018-04-04 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-04 | House | AET CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-04 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-04 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 04/04/18 |
2018-03-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, LINCOLN |
2018-03-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KOPP |
2018-03-09 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2018-03-09 | House | AM: NEUMAN, TALERICO |
2018-03-09 | House | DP: EDGMON, JOSEPHSON, TUCK, LINCOLN |
2018-03-09 | House | AET RPT CS(AET) NT 4DP 2AM |
2018-02-09 | House | AET |
2018-02-09 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |