AK HR1 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - MEMBERS: GILLIS REPLACED REVAK
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - MEMBERS: GILLIS REPLACED REVAK
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
H.sp.cmte:arctic Policy/econ Dev./tourism
Title
H.sp.cmte:arctic Policy/econ Dev./tourism
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | MEMBERS: GILLIS REPLACED REVAK |
2019-05-07 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 5/6 HOUSE RESOLVE 1 |
2019-04-05 | House | 4:45 P.M. 4/4/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-02-19 | House | HANNAN (CHAIR), FIELDS, KREISS-TOMKINS, LINCOLN, TUCK, REVAK, RASMUSSEN |
2019-02-15 | House | VERSION: HR 1 |
2019-02-15 | House | PASSED Y36 E3 A1 |
2019-02-15 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2019-02-15 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
Subjects
Appointments
Business
Economic Development
Economy
International Relations
Legislative Committees
Legislature
Tourism
Business
Economic Development
Economy
International Relations
Legislative Committees
Legislature
Tourism