AK HR2 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - MEMBERS: PRAX REPLACED PRUITT
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - MEMBERS: PRAX REPLACED PRUITT
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Special Committee On Energy
Title
House Special Committee On Energy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | MEMBERS: PRAX REPLACED PRUITT |
2019-05-07 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 5/6 HOUSE RESOLVE 2 |
2019-04-05 | House | 4:45 P.M. 4/4/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-03-29 | House | MEMBERS: SPOHNHOLZ REPLACED FIELDS AS VICE CHAIR |
2019-02-19 | House | RAUSCHER |
2019-02-19 | House | HOPKINS (CHAIR), FIELDS (VICE CHAIR), LINCOLN, SPOHNHOLZ, ZULKOSKY, PRUITT, |
2019-02-15 | House | VERSION: HR 2 |
2019-02-15 | House | PASSED Y37 E3 |
2019-02-15 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2019-02-15 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |