AK HR8 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration to locate its Alaska-focused employees, programs, and assets in the state.
Title
Noaa: Locate Ak. Assets In Ak.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-05-04 | House | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOVERNOR |
2018-05-04 | House | VERSION: HR 8 AM |
2018-05-04 | House | PASSED Y36 N1 E2 A1 |
2018-05-04 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2018-05-04 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-03 | House | ADJOURNED TO 5/4 CALENDAR |
2018-05-02 | House | HELD TO 5/3 CALENDAR |
2018-05-02 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2018 |
2018-05-01 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2018-05-01 | House | DP: LINCOLN, TALERICO, ZULKOSKY, PARISH |
2018-05-01 | House | CRA RPT 4DP |
2018-04-30 | House | CRA |
2018-04-30 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Economic Development
Economy
Employment
Environmental Concerns
Federal Aid
Fish & Game (fish)
Intergovernmental Relations
Marine Facilities
Resources
Science & Technology
Vessels
Water
Economy
Employment
Environmental Concerns
Federal Aid
Fish & Game (fish)
Intergovernmental Relations
Marine Facilities
Resources
Science & Technology
Vessels
Water