AK HR8 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - PERMANENTLY FILED 6/13 HOUSE RESOLVE 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - PERMANENTLY FILED 6/13 HOUSE RESOLVE 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
2019: Int'l Year Of The Salmon
Title
2019: Int'l Year Of The Salmon
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 6/13 HOUSE RESOLVE 8 |
2019-06-03 | House | 11:15 A.M. 5/31/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-30 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2019-05-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY, LEDOUX, WILSON, JOSEPHSON, STORY, STUTES |
2019-05-14 | House | VERSION: CSHR 8(RES) |
2019-05-14 | House | PASSED Y36 N2 A2 |
2019-05-14 | House | RES CS ADOPTED UC |
2019-05-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-05-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2019 |
2019-05-02 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2019-04-29 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2019-04-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN |
2019-04-27 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2019-04-27 | House | NR: HOPKINS, RASMUSSEN |
2019-04-27 | House | DP: TALERICO, HANNAN, TUCK, RAUSCHER, TARR, LINCOLN |
2019-04-27 | House | RES RPT CS(RES) 6DP 2NR |
2019-04-24 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2019-04-24 | House | AM: NEUMAN |
2019-04-24 | House | NR: VANCE |
2019-04-24 | House | DP: TARR, STUTES |
2019-04-24 | House | FSH RPT 2DP 1NR 1AM |
2019-04-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ |
2019-04-10 | House | FSH, RES |
2019-04-10 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska Natives
Economic Development
Economy
Employment
Energy
Environmental Concerns
Fish & Game (fish)
Governor
Hatcheries
Initiatives
Land
Marine Facilities
Water
Zoning
Economic Development
Economy
Employment
Energy
Environmental Concerns
Fish & Game (fish)
Governor
Hatcheries
Initiatives
Land
Marine Facilities
Water
Zoning