AK SB1002 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - PERMANENTLY FILED IN THE (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - PERMANENTLY FILED IN THE (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making a special appropriation for the payment of permanent fund dividends; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Approp: Pfd From Gf, Higher Ed. & Reserve
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Rescind its Previous Action (Y: 10 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate: Table Motion to Rescind (Y: 7 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 4 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate: Table Motion to Rescind (Y: 7 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 4 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED IN THE (S) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | ENGROSSED |
2019-06-10 | Senate | RESCIND ACTION IN FAILING SB 1002 AM FAILED Y10 N10 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | MOTION TO TABLE (RESCIND MOTION) FAILED Y7 N8 E2 A3 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | MOTION TO RESCIND ACTION |
2019-06-04 | Senate | FAILED PASSAGE Y10 N8 E2 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 1002 AM |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-06-04 | 1280 | |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2019-06-04 | 1280 | |
2019-06-04 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-06-04 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 6/4/2019 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | AM: COSTELLO |
2019-06-03 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, VON IMHOF, GIESSEL |
2019-06-03 | Senate | RLS RPT 3DP 1AM |
2019-06-03 | Senate | RLS |
2019-06-03 | Senate | MOTION TO WAIVE UR 24(D) AND REFER TO RLS UC |
2019-06-03 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |