AK SB104 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-01 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 10/28/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-01 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 10/28/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the duties of the Department of Education and Early Development; relating to the duties of the state Board of Education and Early Development; relating to school curricula; relating to a system for managing student information and records related to individualized education programs for children with disabilities; establishing the marijuana education and treatment fund; and relating to the duties of the Department of Health and Social Services to administer a comprehensive marijuana use education and treatment program.
Title
Education: Curriculum; Marijuana; Records
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - House - House: Second Reading Sustain Ruling of the Chair/Amendment No. 4 (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendments to CSSB 104(2d FIN) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - House - House: Second Reading Sustain Ruling of the Chair/Amendment No. 4 (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendments to CSSB 104(2d FIN) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-01 | Senate | DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 10/28/18 |
2018-08-01 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/30 CHAPTER 73 SLA 18 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-07-27 | Senate | 9:40 AM 7/27/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-27 | House | FN5: (EED/FUND CAP) |
2018-06-27 | House | FN4: (EED) |
2018-06-27 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286 |
2018-06-27 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18 |
2018-06-27 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18 |
2018-05-12 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y17 N1 E1 A1 |
2018-05-12 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2018-05-12 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 104(FIN) AM H |
2018-05-12 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2018-05-12 | House | PASSED Y32 N8 |
2018-05-12 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 104(FIN) AM H |
2018-05-12 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-12 | House | SUSTAINED RULING OF CHAIR Y29 N9 A2 |
2018-05-12 | House | AM NO 4 RULED OUT OF ORDER |
2018-05-12 | House | AM NO 3 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN |
2018-05-12 | House | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 34 |
2018-05-12 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2018-05-12 | House | AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y30 N6 A4 |
2018-05-12 | House | AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED |
2018-05-12 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2018-05-12 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2018-05-12 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2018-05-11 | House | HELD IN SECOND READING TO 5/12 CALENDAR |
2018-05-11 | House | FIN HCS ADOPTED UC |
2018-05-11 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-11 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | FN5: (EED/FUND CAP) |
2018-05-10 | House | FN4: (EED) |
2018-05-10 | House | AM: KAWASAKI, TILTON, WILSON |
2018-05-10 | House | NR: PRUITT, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, SEATON |
2018-05-10 | House | DP: GARA, ORTIZ, FOSTER |
2018-05-10 | House | FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 3DP 5NR 3AM |
2018-04-13 | House | FIN |
2018-04-13 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-13 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 104(2D FIN) |
2018-04-13 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-04-13 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N2 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | BEGICH MOTION TO ABSTAIN FROM VOTING |
2018-04-13 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 104(2D FIN) |
2018-04-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-13 | Senate | 2D FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-13 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-13 | Senate | WILSON MOTION TO ABSTAIN FROM VOTING |
2018-04-13 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2018 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | FN4: (EED) |
2018-04-06 | Senate | FN3: (EED/FUND CAP) |
2018-04-06 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2018-04-06 | Senate | FIN RPT CS(2D FIN) 6DP NEW TITLE |
2018-02-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO FINANCE COMMITTEE UC |
2017-04-15 | Senate | FN2: (S.FIN/EED) |
2017-04-15 | Senate | NR: OLSON, MICCICHE |
2017-04-15 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP |
2017-04-15 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE |
2017-04-07 | Senate | FN1: INDETERMINATE(EED) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | NR: BEGICH, STEVENS |
2017-04-07 | Senate | AM: HUGHES, GIESSEL, COGHILL |
2017-04-07 | Senate | EDC RPT 2NR 3AM |
2017-04-03 | Senate | EDC WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | EDC, FIN |
2017-04-03 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Contracts
Disabilities
Drugs
Education
Employment
Funds
Minors
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Records
School Districts
Schools
Teachers
Unorganized Borough
Contracts
Disabilities
Drugs
Education
Employment
Funds
Minors
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Records
School Districts
Schools
Teachers
Unorganized Borough