AK SB115 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-19 - HELD TO NEXT CALENDAR - ADJOURNED SINE DIE
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-19 - HELD TO NEXT CALENDAR - ADJOURNED SINE DIE
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to vehicle registration fees; and relating to the motor fuel tax.
Title
Motor Fuel Tax; Ev Reg. Fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date Clauses (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-19 | House | HELD TO NEXT CALENDAR - ADJOURNED SINE DIE |
2020-05-18 | House | HELD TO 5/19 CALENDAR |
2020-05-18 | House | FN9: (CC:HB205/DOT) |
2020-05-18 | House | FN8: (CC:HB205/DOT) |
2020-05-18 | House | FN7: (CC:HB205/DOT) |
2020-05-18 | House | FN6: (CC:HB205/DOT) |
2020-05-18 | House | FN2: (ADM) |
2020-05-18 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 205 |
2020-05-18 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/3/20 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/3/20 |
2020-03-28 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 3/28 - ON NEXT CALENDAR |
2020-03-27 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 3/27 - ON 3/28 CALENDAR |
2020-03-27 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2020-03-27 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/2020 |
2020-03-24 | House | FN5: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2020-03-24 | House | FN4: ZERO(DOT) |
2020-03-24 | House | FN2: (ADM) |
2020-03-24 | House | NR: MERRICK, TILTON |
2020-03-24 | House | DNP: CARPENTER, SULLIVAN-LEONARD |
2020-03-24 | House | DP: WOOL, JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, LEBON, KNOPP, JOHNSTON, FOSTER |
2020-03-24 | House | TECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE |
2020-03-24 | House | FIN RPT HCS(FIN) NT 7DP 2DNP 2NR |
2020-03-13 | House | FN3: ZERO(DOT) |
2020-03-13 | House | FN2: (ADM) |
2020-03-13 | House | FN1: (REV) |
2020-03-13 | House | NR: TALERICO, GILLIS |
2020-03-13 | House | DP: STORY, EDGMON, CLAMAN, DRUMMOND, STUTES |
2020-03-13 | House | TRA RPT HCS(TRA) 5DP 2NR |
2020-03-03 | House | TRA, FIN |
2020-03-03 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2020-03-02 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 115(FIN)(EFD FLD) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y13 N4 E3 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | PASSED Y12 N5 E3 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 115(FIN) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/2 CALENDAR |
2020-02-28 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2020-02-28 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2020-02-28 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/28/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(DOT) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | FN2: (ADM) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | FN1: (REV) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | DNP: WIELECHOWSKI |
2020-02-21 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN, WILSON, OLSON |
2020-02-21 | Senate | DP: VON IMHOF, HOFFMAN, BISHOP |
2020-02-21 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 3DP 1DNP 3NR NEW TITLE |
2019-04-24 | Senate | FIN |
2019-04-24 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |