AK SB12 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - GRAY-JACKSON, HOFFMAN, VON IMHOF, BISHOP, STEDMAN, WIELECHOWSKI
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - GRAY-JACKSON, HOFFMAN, VON IMHOF, BISHOP, STEDMAN, WIELECHOWSKI
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to crime and criminal procedure; relating to assault and sexual assault; relating to harassment; relating to credit toward a sentence of imprisonment for time spent in a treatment program or under electronic monitoring; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Assault; Sex Offenses; Sentencing Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | GRAY-JACKSON, HOFFMAN, VON IMHOF, BISHOP, STEDMAN, WIELECHOWSKI |
2019-03-29 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): SHOWER, COGHILL, KAWASAKI, COSTELLO, STEVENS, REINBOLD |
2019-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-06 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(AJS) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(LAW) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(DHS) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | AM: REINBOLD |
2019-03-06 | Senate | DP: HUGHES, MICCICHE, SHOWER, KIEHL |
2019-03-06 | Senate | JUD RPT CS 4DP 1AM NEW TITLE |
2019-02-25 | Senate | JUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | JUD, FIN |
2019-02-13 | Senate | SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS |
2019-02-08 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES |
2019-01-16 | Senate | JUD, FIN |
2019-01-16 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-01-16 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/19 |