AK SB123 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to electric and telephone cooperatives; relating to telephone service and related telecommunications services; relating to the creation and regulation of electric reliability organizations; relating to participation of electric utilities in electric reliability organizations; relating to duties of electric reliability organizations; providing for integrated resource planning; requiring project preapproval for certain interconnected large energy facilities; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Electric Reliability Orgs; Telecom Co-ops
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 123(RBE) Effective Dates (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2020-05-18 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 4/29 CHAPTER 29 SLA 20 |
2020-05-18 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2020-05-18 | Senate | 10:15 AM 4/13/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-03-20 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2020-03-20 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y17 N- E3 |
2020-03-19 | House | VERSION: CSSB 123(RBE) AM H |
2020-03-19 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2020-03-19 | House | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 18 |
2020-03-19 | House | LEGISLATIVE LETTER OF INTENT ADOPTED UC |
2020-03-19 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y34 E6 |
2020-03-19 | House | PASSED Y33 N1 E6 |
2020-03-19 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 123(RBE) AM H |
2020-03-19 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2020-03-19 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2020-03-19 | 1959 | |
2020-03-19 | 1959 | |
2020-03-19 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2020-03-19 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2020-03-19 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2020-03-19 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-13 | House | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2020-03-13 | House | SENATE LETTER OF INTENT WITH RES REPORT |
2020-03-13 | House | DP: TUCK, HANNAN, TALERICO, SPOHNHOLZ, HOPKINS, TARR, LINCOLN |
2020-03-13 | House | RES RPT 7DP |
2020-03-11 | House | SENATE LETTER OF INTENT |
2020-03-11 | House | RES |
2020-03-11 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2020-03-10 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 123(RBE) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2020-03-10 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 123(RBE) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2020-03-10 | Senate | ADOPTED RBE LETTER OF INTENT |
2020-03-10 | Senate | RBE CS ADOPTED UC |
2020-03-10 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2020-03-10 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN, OLSON |
2020-03-09 | Senate | DP: VON IMHOF, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, BISHOP |
2020-03-09 | Senate | FIN RPT CS(RBE) 4DP 2NR |
2020-02-26 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE |
2020-02-26 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, GRAY-JACKSON |
2020-02-26 | Senate | LETTER OF INTENT WITH RBE REPORT |
2020-02-26 | Senate | RBE RPT CS 2DP 1NR NEW TITLE |
2019-05-14 | Senate | RBE, FIN |
2019-05-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Business
Communications
Energy
Financial Institutions
Hearings
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Utilities
Regulatory Actions
Utilities
Communications
Energy
Financial Institutions
Hearings
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Utilities
Regulatory Actions
Utilities