AK SB15 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to possession of an electronic smoking product or a product containing nicotine by a minor and to selling or giving a product containing nicotine or an electronic smoking product to a minor; relating to business license endorsements to sell cigarettes, cigars, tobacco, products containing tobacco, electronic smoking products, or products containing nicotine; relating to citations for certain offenses concerning tobacco, products containing nicotine, or electronic smoking products; and providing for an effective date.
Title
E-cigs/tobacco/nicotine & Minors; Sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - House - House: Second Reading Advance to Third Reading on the Same Day (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 15(FIN) Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - House - House: Second Reading Advance to Third Reading on the Same Day (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 15(FIN) Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-16 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2018-07-16 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/13 CHAPTER 57 SLA 18 |
2018-07-10 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-07-10 | Senate | 11:17 AM 7/10/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-27 | House | FN7: (CED) |
2018-06-27 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286 |
2018-06-27 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18 |
2018-06-27 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18 |
2018-05-12 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-12 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1 |
2018-05-12 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2018-05-12 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 15(L&C) |
2018-05-12 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2018-05-12 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, ZULKOSKY, SADDLER, JOSEPHSON, KAWASAKI, TUCK |
2018-05-12 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-12 | House | PASSED Y37 N3 |
2018-05-12 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 15(L&C) |
2018-05-12 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING Y37 N1 A2 |
2018-05-12 | House | L&C HCS ADOPTED UC |
2018-05-12 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-12 | House | RULES TO 2ND SUP CALENDAR 5/12/18 |
2018-04-26 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP |
2018-04-20 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA |
2018-04-17 | House | FN7: (CED) |
2018-04-17 | House | FN6: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2018-04-17 | House | AM: WILSON, TILTON |
2018-04-17 | House | DP: GARA, PRUITT, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, SEATON |
2018-04-17 | House | TECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE |
2018-04-17 | House | FIN RPT HCS(L&C) NT 6DP 2AM |
2018-04-02 | House | FN7: (CED) |
2018-04-02 | House | FN6: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2018-04-02 | House | NR: STUTES, WOOL, BIRCH |
2018-04-02 | House | DP: KITO |
2018-04-02 | House | TECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE |
2018-04-02 | House | L&C RPT HCS(L&C) NT 1DP 3NR |
2018-03-09 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRENN |
2018-03-09 | House | L&C, FIN |
2018-03-09 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-03-08 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 15(FIN) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E2 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 15(FIN) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-03-08 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-03-08 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-03-08 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/8/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | FN7: (CED) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | FN6: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2018-02-28 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2018-02-28 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 6DP 1NR NEW TITLE |
2018-02-21 | Senate | WIELECHOWSKI, WILSON, KELLY, BISHOP |
2018-02-21 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, COSTELLO, MACKINNON, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, HUGHES, MEYER |
2017-04-10 | Senate | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD |
2017-04-10 | Senate | FN5:(CED) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(DPS) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(LAW) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | AM: MEYER |
2017-04-10 | Senate | DP: WIELECHOWSKI, KELLY, COSTELLO |
2017-04-10 | Senate | NR: COGHILL |
2017-04-10 | Senate | JUD RPT CS 3DP 1NR 1AM NEW TITLE |
2017-03-06 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(DPS) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(LAW) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, HUGHES, MEYER, GARDNER |
2017-03-06 | Senate | L&C RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE |
2017-01-18 | Senate | L&C, JUD |
2017-01-18 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-01-18 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/13/17 |