AK SB165 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Alaska comprehensive health insurance fund; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Comprehensive Health Insurance Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2018-07-02 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 46 SLA 18 |
2018-06-27 | Senate | 2:32 PM 6/12/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-05-01 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, JOSEPHSON |
2018-05-01 | House | VERSION: SB 165 |
2018-05-01 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-01 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-01 | House | PASSED Y37 N1 E2 |
2018-05-01 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 165 |
2018-04-30 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA |
2018-04-30 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/1 CALENDAR |
2018-04-30 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-30 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | FN3: (CED) |
2018-04-11 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2018-04-11 | House | FOSTER |
2018-04-11 | House | DP: GARA, WILSON, PRUITT, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, TILTON, SEATON, |
2018-04-11 | House | FIN RPT 10DP |
2018-04-02 | House | FN3: (CED) |
2018-04-02 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2018-04-02 | House | NR: STUTES, BIRCH |
2018-04-02 | House | DP: WOOL, KITO |
2018-04-02 | House | L&C RPT 2DP 2NR |
2018-03-07 | House | L&C, FIN |
2018-03-07 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-03-05 | Senate | VERSION: SB 165 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, MICCICHE, BISHOP, COSTELLO, MEYER |
2018-03-05 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-03-05 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 165 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-03-05 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-03-05 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/5/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2018-02-28 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2018-02-28 | Senate | FIN RPT 6DP 1NR |
2018-02-26 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, STEVENS, MICCICHE, MEYER, GARDNER |
2018-02-26 | Senate | L&C RPT 5DP |
2018-01-26 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2018-01-26 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |