AK SB193 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-04 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-04 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act requiring the Department of Health and Social Services to apply for a waiver to establish work requirements for certain adults who are eligible for the state medical assistance program.
Title
Med. Assistance Work Requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Kelly [R] | Sen. Shelley Hughes [R] | Sen. David Wilson [R] | Sen. Peter Micciche [R] |
Sen. Catherine Giessel [R] | Rep. Charles Kopp [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Take up Reconsideration Same Day (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 11 (Y: 4 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 10 (Y: 3 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 9 (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 8 (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 7 (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 7 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 8 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Take up Reconsideration Same Day (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 11 (Y: 4 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 10 (Y: 3 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 9 (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 8 (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 7 (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 7 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 8 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP |
2018-05-04 | House | SENATE LETTER OF INTENT |
2018-05-04 | House | REFERRED TO HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES |
2018-05-04 | House | HSS, FIN |
2018-05-04 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-05-03 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 193(HSS) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y14 N3 E2 A1 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY Y14 N3 E2 A1 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | WIELECHOWSKI NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2018-05-03 | Senate | PASSED Y14 N4 E2 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 193(HSS) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-03 | Senate | AM NO 11 FAILED Y4 N14 E2 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | AM NO 10 FAILED Y3 N14 E2 A1 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | AM NO 9 FAILED Y4 N15 E1 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | AM NO 8 FAILED Y4 N15 E1 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | AM NO 7 FAILED Y4 N15 E1 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | AM NO 6 FAILED Y7 N12 E1 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | AM NO 5 FAILED Y8 N11 E1 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | AM NO 4 FAILED Y4 N15 E1 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | AM NO 3 FAILED Y4 N15 E1 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | AM NO 2 FAILED Y4 N15 E1 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN |
2018-05-03 | Senate | ADOPTED SENATE LETTER OF INTENT UC |
2018-05-03 | Senate | HSS CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-05-03 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-03 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | FN12: (S.FIN/DHS) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | FN11: (S.FIN/DHS) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | FN10: (S.FIN/DHS) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | FN9: INDETERMINATE(S.FIN/ADM) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | FN8: ZERO(LWF) |
2018-05-02 | Senate | NR: STEVENS, OLSON |
2018-05-02 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE |
2018-05-02 | Senate | LETTER OF INTENT WITH FIN REPORT |
2018-05-02 | Senate | FIN RPT CS(HSS) 3DP 2NR |
2018-03-28 | Senate | FN8: ZERO(LWF) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | FN7: (DHS) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | FN6: (DHS) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | FN5: (DHS) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | FN4: (DHS) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | FN3: (DHS) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | FN2: (DHS) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | FN1: (ADM) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | NR: VON IMHOF |
2018-03-28 | Senate | DNP: BEGICH |
2018-03-28 | Senate | DP: WILSON, MICCICHE, GIESSEL |
2018-03-28 | Senate | HSS RPT CS 3DP 1DNP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2018-02-19 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, GIESSEL |
2018-02-19 | Senate | HSS, FIN |
2018-02-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |