AK SB195 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/19/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/19/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to election of a domestic insurer's board of directors.
Title
Bd Of Directors: Domestic Insurers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/19/20 |
2020-05-18 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 4/20 CHAPTER 21 SLA 20 |
2020-05-18 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2020-05-18 | Senate | 2:15 PM 4/7/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-03-26 | House | VERSION: SB 195 |
2020-03-26 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2020-03-26 | House | PASSED Y36 E4 |
2020-03-26 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 195 |
2020-03-26 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2020-03-26 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2020-03-26 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/2020 |
2020-03-21 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2020-03-21 | House | DP: FIELDS, STUTES, STORY, GILLIS, HANNAN, SPOHNHOLZ |
2020-03-21 | House | L&C RPT 6DP |
2020-03-18 | House | L&C |
2020-03-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2020-03-17 | Senate | VERSION: SB 195 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N- E3 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 195 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/17 CALENDAR |
2020-03-16 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2020-03-13 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS, REVAK |
2020-03-11 | Senate | L&C RPT 4DP |
2020-02-17 | Senate | L&C |
2020-02-17 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |