AK SB198 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to a study of the effectiveness and cost of providing long-acting reversible contraception to women with substance abuse disorders.
Title
Uaa Long-acting Contraception Study
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Kelly [R] | Sen. Catherine Giessel [R] | Sen. Peter Micciche [R] | Sen. Natasha von Imhof [R] |
Rep. Ivy Spohnholz [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2018-04-11 | House | REFERRED TO HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES |
2018-04-11 | House | HSS, FIN |
2018-04-11 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-09 | Senate | VERSION: SB 198 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N1 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, VON IMHOF |
2018-04-09 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2018-04-09 | Senate | AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN |
2018-04-09 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2018-04-09 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 198 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL |
2018-04-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/9 CALENDAR |
2018-04-06 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-06 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2018 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | FN1: (UA) |
2018-04-04 | Senate | NR: HOFFMAN |
2018-04-04 | Senate | DP: MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS |
2018-04-04 | Senate | FIN RPT 4DP 1NR |
2018-02-19 | Senate | FIN |
2018-02-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |