AK SB25 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/2/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/2/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination date of the Board of Dental Examiners; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extend Board Of Dental Examiners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/2/19 |
2019-10-23 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 8/1 CHAPTER 14 SLA 19 |
2019-07-27 | Senate | 3:55 P.M. 7/22/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-04-29 | House | VERSION: SB 25 |
2019-04-29 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2019-04-29 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-04-29 | House | PASSED Y38 N2 |
2019-04-29 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 25 |
2019-04-27 | House | HELD TO 4/29 CALENDAR |
2019-04-26 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/27 CALENDAR |
2019-04-26 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-04-26 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | FN2: (CED) |
2019-04-24 | House | NR: WILSON |
2019-04-24 | House | SULLIVAN-LEONARD, ORTIZ, FOSTER |
2019-04-24 | House | DP: JOHNSTON, CARPENTER, TILTON, LEBON, KNOPP, MERRICK, JOSEPHSON, |
2019-04-24 | House | FIN RPT 10DP 1NR |
2019-04-03 | House | FIN |
2019-04-03 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-04-01 | Senate | VERSION: SB 25 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-04-01 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E2 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 25 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-04-01 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-04-01 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/1/2019 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | NR: BISHOP |
2019-03-08 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, WILSON |
2019-03-08 | Senate | FIN RPT 7DP 1NR |
2019-02-08 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | DP: REINBOLD, BIRCH, BISHOP, COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON |
2019-02-08 | Senate | L&C RPT 5DP |
2019-01-18 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2019-01-18 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |