AK SB52 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-19 - HELD TO NEXT CALENDAR - ADJOURNED SINE DIE
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-19 - HELD TO NEXT CALENDAR - ADJOURNED SINE DIE
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to alcoholic beverages; relating to the regulation of manufacturers, wholesalers, and retailers of alcoholic beverages; relating to licenses, endorsements, and permits involving alcoholic beverages; relating to common carrier approval to transport or deliver alcoholic beverages; relating to the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board; relating to offenses involving alcoholic beverages; amending Rule 17(h), Alaska Rules of Minor Offense Procedure; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Control; Alcohol Reg
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-21 - House - House: Waive Uniform Rule 23(a) Separate SB 172 (Y: 15 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-19 | House | HELD TO NEXT CALENDAR - ADJOURNED SINE DIE |
2020-05-18 | House | HELD TO 5/19 CALENDAR |
2020-05-18 | House | FN8: (AJS) |
2020-05-18 | House | FN6: (CED) |
2020-05-18 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 205 |
2020-05-18 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/3/20 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/3/20 |
2020-03-28 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 3/28 - ON NEXT CALENDAR |
2020-03-28 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/28/2020 |
2020-03-28 | House | FN9: ZERO(S.FIN/COMBINED) |
2020-03-28 | House | FN8: (AJS) |
2020-03-28 | House | FN7: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2020-03-28 | House | FN6: (CED) |
2020-03-28 | House | AM: WOOL |
2020-03-28 | House | NR: JOSEPHSON, CARPENTER, TILTON, LEBON, KNOPP |
2020-03-28 | House | DP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, ORTIZ, JOHNSTON |
2020-03-28 | House | FIN RPT 3DP 5NR 1AM |
2020-03-27 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 3/27 - ON 3/28 CALENDAR |
2020-03-27 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2020-03-27 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RPT/REF |
2020-03-23 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2020-03-23 | House | FIN WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A) UC |
2020-03-21 | House | MOTION TO WAIVE RULE 23(A) WITHDRAWN |
2020-03-21 | House | PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A) NOT WAIVED SB 52 |
2020-03-21 | House | MOTION DIVIDE QUESTION W/O SB 52 (PSD) Y17 N15 E6 A2 |
2020-03-21 | House | MOTION DIVIDE QUESTION W/O SB 172 (FLD) Y15 N17 E6 A2 |
2020-03-21 | House | W/ SB 55, SB 134, SB 155, SB 172 |
2020-03-21 | House | MOTION TO WAIVE FIN PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A) |
2020-03-18 | House | FN9: ZERO(S.FIN/COMBINED) |
2020-03-18 | House | FN8: (AJS) |
2020-03-18 | House | FN7: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2020-03-18 | House | FN6: (CED) |
2020-03-18 | House | NR: STUTES |
2020-03-18 | House | DP: HANNAN, STORY, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ |
2020-03-18 | House | L&C RPT 4DP 1NR |
2020-02-28 | House | L&C, FIN |
2020-02-28 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2020-02-26 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 52(FIN) AM |
2020-02-26 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2020-02-26 | Senate | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2020-02-26 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | 1867 | |
2020-02-26 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM #1 UC |
2020-02-26 | 1867 | |
2020-02-26 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM #2 UC |
2020-02-26 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 52(FIN) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/26 CALENDAR |
2020-02-24 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2020-02-24 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2020-02-24 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/24/2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | FN9: ZERO(S.FIN/COMBINED) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | FN8: (AJS) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | FN7: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | FN6: (CED) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | AM: WILSON |
2020-02-19 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI, HOFFMAN |
2020-02-19 | Senate | DP: VON IMHOF, BISHOP |
2020-02-21 | Senate | FIN CS RECIEVED SAME TITLE |
2020-02-19 | Senate | FIN RPT CS FORTHCOMING 2DP 2NR 1AM |
2019-05-06 | Senate | FN5: (CED) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(DHS) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | FN2: (REV) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | AM: KIEHL |
2019-04-29 | Senate | DP: HUGHES, MICCICHE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | JUD RPT CS 2DP 1AM SAME TITLE |
2019-04-17 | Senate | FN4: (CED) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(DHS) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | FN2: (REV) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | DP: REINBOLD, COSTELLO, BIRCH, BISHOP |
2019-04-19 | Senate | L&C CS RECEIVED SAME TITLE |
2019-04-17 | Senate | L&C RPT CS FORTHCOMING 4DP |
2019-02-11 | Senate | L&C, JUD, FIN |
2019-02-11 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Age Of Persons
Alcohol
Assessments
Auctions
Boards & Commissions
Court Rules
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Fees
Health & Social Services
Law Enforcement
Liability
Licensing
Minors
Municipalities
Nonprofit Organizations
Permits
Public Accommodations
Public Records
Public Safety
Safety
Sales
Tourism
Trade Practices
Unorganized Borough
Alcohol
Assessments
Auctions
Boards & Commissions
Court Rules
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Fees
Health & Social Services
Law Enforcement
Liability
Licensing
Minors
Municipalities
Nonprofit Organizations
Permits
Public Accommodations
Public Records
Public Safety
Safety
Sales
Tourism
Trade Practices
Unorganized Borough