AK SB53 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - COSPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - COSPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the duties of the Board of Regents of the University of Alaska.
Title
University Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Stevens [R] | Sen. Tom Begich [D] | Sen. Click Bishop [R] | Sen. Shelley Hughes [R] |
Sen. John Coghill [R] | Sen. Mia Costello [R] | Sen. Chris Birch [R] | Sen. William Wielechowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI |
2019-02-27 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): BIRCH |
2019-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-27 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(UA) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | DP: STEVENS, BEGICH, HUGHES, BIRCH |
2019-02-27 | Senate | EDC RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE |
2019-02-25 | Senate | EDC WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO |
2019-02-11 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): BEGICH, BISHOP, HUGHES, COGHILL |
2019-02-11 | Senate | EDC, FIN |
2019-02-11 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=SB53 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/SB0053A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/SB0053B.PDF |