AK SB81 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to electric and telephone cooperatives; and relating to telephone service and related telecommunications services.
Title
Telephone Cooperatives;telecommunications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE |
2020-03-05 | House | L&C |
2020-03-05 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2020-03-04 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 81(L&C) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E2 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 81(L&C) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/4 CALENDAR |
2020-03-02 | Senate | L&C CS ADOPTED UC |
2020-03-02 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2020-02-28 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS, REVAK |
2020-02-26 | Senate | L&C RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE |
2019-03-06 | Senate | L&C |
2019-03-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Communications
Cooperatives
Corporations
Data Processing
Internet
Nonprofit Organizations
Science & Technology
Cooperatives
Corporations
Data Processing
Internet
Nonprofit Organizations
Science & Technology