AK SB83 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Regulatory Commission of Alaska; relating to the public utility regulatory cost charge; relating to the regulation of telecommunications; relating to exemptions, charges, and rates applicable to telecommunications utilities; relating to regulation of telephone services; relating to exempt employees; and relating to alternate operator services.
Title
Telecommunications Regulation/exemptions
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Birch [R] | Rep. Charles Kopp [R] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to SB 83 (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/27/19 |
2019-10-23 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 8/29 CHAPTER 24 SLA 19 |
2019-10-23 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2019-10-23 | Senate | 1:15 P.M. 8/23/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-14 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y18 N2 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2019-05-14 | House | VERSION: HCS SB 83(L&C) |
2019-05-14 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2019-05-14 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP, TUCK |
2019-05-14 | House | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 7 |
2019-05-14 | House | PASSED Y33 N7 |
2019-05-14 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 83(L&C) |
2019-05-14 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-05-14 | House | L&C HCS ADOPTED UC |
2019-05-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-05-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2019-05-14 | House | DNP: EASTMAN |
2019-05-14 | House | DP: WOOL, KOPP, SHAW, THOMPSON, CLAMAN |
2019-05-14 | House | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 7 |
2019-05-14 | House | JUD RPT HCS(L&C) NT 5DP 1DNP |
2019-05-13 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2019-05-13 | House | DP: HANNAN, REVAK, TALERICO, STUTES, WOOL |
2019-05-13 | House | PENDING TITLE CHANGE HCR |
2019-05-13 | House | L&C RPT HCS(L&C) NT 5DP |
2019-04-17 | House | JUD REPLACES FIN REFERRAL |
2019-04-16 | House | L&C, FIN |
2019-04-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-04-15 | Senate | VERSION: SB 83 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N2 E1 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 83 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-04-15 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-04-15 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | DP: REINBOLD, GRAY-JACKSON, COSTELLO, BIRCH |
2019-04-03 | Senate | L&C RPT 4DP |
2019-03-11 | Senate | L&C |
2019-03-11 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |