AK SB9 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/29/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/29/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to military facility zones; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Military Facility Zones
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/29/17 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 4/28 CHAPTER 4 SLA 17 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 5:00 PM 4/26/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-04-12 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR, GRENN, JOSEPHSON |
2017-04-12 | House | VERSION: CSSB 9(FIN) |
2017-04-12 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2017-04-12 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-04-12 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2017-04-12 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 9(FIN) |
2017-04-12 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-04-12 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-12 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): SADDLER |
2017-03-16 | House | FN1: ZERO(MVA) |
2017-03-16 | House | DP: WESTLAKE, TALERICO, FANSLER, PARISH |
2017-03-16 | House | CRA RPT 4DP |
2017-03-13 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI |
2017-03-06 | House | CRA |
2017-03-06 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-03-01 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 9(FIN) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-03-01 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2017-03-01 | Senate | HUGHES, KELLY |
2017-03-01 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, GIESSEL, STEDMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, STEVENS, MICCICHE, |
2017-03-01 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 9(FIN) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-03-01 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2017-03-01 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-03-01 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(MVA) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE |
2017-02-15 | Senate | NR: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, DUNLEAVY, OLSON |
2017-02-15 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 3DP 4NR NEW TITLE |
2017-02-03 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(MVA) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, GARDNER, MACKINNON |
2017-02-03 | Senate | CRA RPT CS 3DP SAME TITLE |
2017-01-18 | Senate | CRA, FIN |
2017-01-18 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-01-18 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17 |