AK SB93 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to a workforce enhancement program for health care professionals employed in the state; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Medical Provider Incentives/loan Repaym't
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 93(HSS) Effective Dates (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2019-10-23 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 8/1 CHAPTER 15 SLA 19 |
2019-07-27 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2019-07-27 | Senate | 3:55 P.M. 7/22/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-01 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-05-01 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N- |
2019-05-01 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 93(FIN) |
2019-05-01 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2019-05-01 | House | LINCOLN, STUTES, STORY |
2019-05-01 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOPKINS, TARR, JACKSON, JOHNSTON, KOPP, JOSEPHSON, ZULKOSKY, |
2019-05-01 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-05-01 | House | PASSED Y39 A1 |
2019-05-01 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 93(FIN) |
2019-05-01 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-05-01 | House | FIN HCS ADOPTED UC |
2019-05-01 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-05-01 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-26 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, RAUSCHER |
2019-04-26 | House | FN3: (DHS) |
2019-04-26 | House | ORTIZ, WILSON, FOSTER |
2019-04-26 | House | DP: JOHNSTON, CARPENTER, TILTON, LEBON, MERRICK, JOSEPHSON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, |
2019-04-26 | House | FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 10DP |
2019-04-24 | House | FIN |
2019-04-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-04-22 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 93(HSS) |
2019-04-22 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2019-04-22 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-04-22 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 93(HSS) |
2019-04-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-04-22 | Senate | HSS CS ADOPTED UC |
2019-04-22 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-04-22 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | FN2: (DHS) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN, OLSON |
2019-04-17 | Senate | DP: VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, WIELECHOWSKI, BISHOP |
2019-04-17 | Senate | FIN RPT CS(HSS) 4DP 2NR |
2019-04-10 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): BISHOP, STEVENS, GIESSEL |
2019-04-05 | Senate | FN2: (DHS) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | DP: WILSON, COGHILL, BEGICH, GIESSEL |
2019-04-05 | Senate | HSS RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE |
2019-03-27 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): BEGICH |
2019-03-18 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): KIEHL, MICCICHE |
2019-03-18 | Senate | HSS, FIN |
2019-03-18 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Dentists
Employment
Grants
Health & Social Services
Loans
Medical Care
Mental Health
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Pharmacists
Physicians
Psychologists
Public Assistance
Senior Citizens
State Aid
Sunset
Universities
Unorganized Borough
Employment
Grants
Health & Social Services
Loans
Medical Care
Mental Health
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Pharmacists
Physicians
Psychologists
Public Assistance
Senior Citizens
State Aid
Sunset
Universities
Unorganized Borough