AK SCR15 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proclaiming April 16, 2019, as Alaska Education and Sharing Day.
Title
April 16, 2019:ak Education & Sharing Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to SCR 15 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Senate | LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 20 |
2018-06-27 | Senate | 2:43 PM 5/24/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-04-06 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2018-04-04 | House | VERSION: SCR 15 AM H |
2018-04-04 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2018-04-04 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA |
2018-04-04 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2018-04-04 | House | AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED |
2018-04-04 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2018-04-04 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y40 |
2018-04-04 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-02 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 4/2 - ON 4/4 CALENDAR |
2018-03-30 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 3/30 - ON 4/2 CALENDAR |
2018-03-29 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 3/29 - ON 3/30 CALENDAR |
2018-03-28 | House | TECHNICAL SESSION 3/28 - ON 3/29 CALENDAR |
2018-03-27 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 3/27 - ON 3/28 CALENDAR |
2018-03-26 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 3/26 - ON 3/27 CALENDAR |
2018-03-26 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-22 | House | RLS |
2018-03-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-03-21 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 15 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-03-21 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2018-03-21 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-03-21 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | NR: BEGICH |
2018-03-14 | Senate | DP: STEVENS, COGHILL, HUGHES |
2018-03-14 | Senate | EDC RPT 3DP 1NR |
2018-02-02 | Senate | EDC |
2018-02-02 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |