AK SCR27 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - LEGISLATIVE RESOVE 44
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - LEGISLATIVE RESOVE 44
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 299, relating to the authority of the director of the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board; extending the termination date of the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board; and relating to the application of precedent to decisions of the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 299
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Senate | LEGISLATIVE RESOVE 44 |
2018-06-27 | Senate | 2:34 PM 6/12/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-05-10 | House | VERSION: SCR 27 |
2018-05-10 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-10 | House | PASSED Y37 A3 |
2018-05-10 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2018-05-04 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2018-05-03 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 27 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N- E2 A1 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2018-05-03 | Senate | TAKEN UP UC |
2018-05-02 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |