AK SCR3 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-18 - PERMANENTLY FILED 11/13 LEGIS RESOLVE 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-18 - PERMANENTLY FILED 11/13 LEGIS RESOLVE 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Joint Resolution No. 5, urging the United States Congress to pass legislation to open the coastal plain of the Arctic National Wildlife Refuge to oil and gas development; urging the United States Department of the Interior to recognize the private property rights of owners of land in and adjacent to the Arctic National Wildlife Refuge; relating to oil and gas exploration, development, production, and royalties; and relating to renewable and alternative energy technologies.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hjr 5
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-18 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED 11/13 LEGIS RESOLVE 3 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 9:25 AM 3/8/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-02-24 | House | VERSION: SCR 3 |
2017-02-24 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2017-02-24 | House | PASSED Y36 N1 E3 |
2017-02-24 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2017-02-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2017-02-22 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 3 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2017-02-22 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2017-02-22 | Senate | TAKEN UP UC |
2017-02-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |
Subjects
Energy
Fish & Game (game)
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Oil & Gas
Proclamations
Public Land
Resources
Revenue
Statehood Act
Uniform Rules
Fish & Game (game)
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Oil & Gas
Proclamations
Public Land
Resources
Revenue
Statehood Act
Uniform Rules